MANCHESTER UNITED FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1118310
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £3.33m £3.89m £4.91m £6.70m £3.91m
Total expenditure £3.36m £3.45m £4.31m £4.71m £4.30m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £1.33k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £34.15k £57.86k N/A N/A £6.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £1.14m £1.19m £1.55m £1.41m £1.36m
Income - Other trading activities £843.47k £992.24k £1.58m £0 £603.21k
Income - Charitable activities £1.33m £1.69m £1.78m £1.77m £2.66m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £12.34k £9.04k £4.70k £13.73k £228
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £3.50m £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.48m £2.40m £2.89m £2.65m £3.63m
Expenditure - Raising funds £878.32k £1.05m £1.42m £2.07m £672.68k
Expenditure - Governance £11.85k £18.37k £16.96k £18.27k £19.49k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0