FRIENDSHIP SOCIETY

Charity number: 1121095
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £297.27k £338.09k £254.44k £251.71k £260.25k
Total expenditure £303.24k £336.49k £258.00k £254.44k £258.57k
Income from government contracts £31.02k £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £31.02k £3.34k £1.89k N/A N/A