THE RICHARD BEHREND CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1119728
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £10.91k £11.81k £11.19k £11.38k £10.63k
Total expenditure £7.28k £3.28k £16.77k £475 £10.48k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A