ST JAMES SCHOOL PTFA

Charity number: 1119822
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £5.31k £4.43k £3.50k £3.81k £5.07k
Total expenditure £7.45k £1.98k £3.06k £5.29k £2.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A