Trustees MARYMOUNT INTERNATIONAL SCHOOL
Charity number: 1117786
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Umerah Akram | Trustee | 05 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Shankar Athreya | Trustee | 05 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Kellaway | Trustee | 15 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Etain Fitzpatrick | Trustee | 05 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Naoko Wakiwaka | Trustee | 05 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anna Panczyk | Trustee | 05 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sofia Alix Marie-Claire Schaffgotsch | Trustee | 06 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Niamh Green | Trustee | 06 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Jane Crowley | Trustee | 04 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Paloma Martinez Alvaro | Trustee | 09 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Cristina Serrano | Trustee | 04 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
SISTER MARY JO MARTIN | Trustee | 12 January 2016 |
|
|||||
SISTER CATHERINE VINCIE | Trustee | 01 October 2015 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.