Trustees DERBY REFUGEE FORUM
Charity number: 1121582
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOAN STANNARD | Chair | 11 July 2011 |
|
|
||||||
Nedzad Salkic | Trustee | 05 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Trish Haddon | Trustee | 05 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Bethany Lesley Sheldon | Trustee | 04 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Sarah Wall | Trustee | 04 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Omar Hamed Elshafiee | Trustee | 04 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Muna Younis | Trustee | 02 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Nasrin Samavi | Trustee | 04 September 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Janet Rose Fuller | Trustee | 19 September 2016 |
|
|
||||||
FERID KEVRIC | Trustee |
|
||||||||
REVD MRS MAUREEN ANNE PRIDDIN BA DIPED | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.