Financial history COMPASS LEARNING CENTRE

Charity number: 1118489
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £126.72k £157.20k £138.00k £152.09k £157.86k
Total expenditure £91.64k £106.15k £123.71k £101.51k £109.39k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £51.65k