Financial history THE LEAVER FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1117745
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 04/01/2018 04/01/2019 04/01/2020 04/01/2021 04/01/2022
Total gross income £22.86k £24.87k £20.77k £8.11k £25.73k
Total expenditure £31.78k £24.50k £8.21k £35.74k £29.62k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A