Trustees MANSFIELD BOWLING CLUB
Charity number: 1117767
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jane Hurst | Trustee | 20 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Czubkowski | Trustee | 20 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Shaun Henshaw | Trustee | 21 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Wood | Trustee | 22 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paul Sanderson | Trustee | 22 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Tye | Trustee | 07 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Morrow | Trustee | 05 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
PETER ARMITAGE | Trustee | 20 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
TREVOR LIVINGS | Trustee | 20 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL COOPER | Trustee | 16 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
HAZEL SOUTHERINGTON | Trustee | 24 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
JOHN STUART HALLOWS | Trustee | 25 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
ELEANOR MARGARET LAKE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MELVIN SAVIDGE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.