Accounts and annual returns NXT MINISTRIES
Charity number: 1118074
Charity reporting is overdue by 1547 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 86 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 86 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 10 July 2023 | 155 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 10 July 2023 | 520 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 816 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 10 July 2023 | 885 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 1181 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2019 | 10 July 2023 | 1251 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2019 | Overdue | Overdue by 1547 days |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window