THE RATES FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1118217
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 20 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 25 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 28 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 12 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 30 November 2017 30 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 24 February 2017 116 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required