Financial history WORD OF FAITH MISSION

Charity number: 1118386
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £97.03k £107.76k £87.09k £56.66k £46.96k
Total expenditure £89.72k £92.67k £83.78k £43.49k £35.09k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £4.47k £3.48k