L.H.H. LIMITED

Charity number: 1118446
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £75.35k £59.62k £123.36k £78.68k £54.45k
Total expenditure £68.29k £66.75k £88.70k £85.82k £92.45k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A