FLETCHER PRIEST ARCHITECTS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1118694
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2020 19 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2019 27 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2018 01 March 2019 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2017 14 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2016 03 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2016 Not Required