ROTHERFIELD ST MARTIN

Charity number: 1119458
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sharon Elizabeth Bohane Trustee 27 July 2021
ROTHERFIELD ST MARTIN Received: On time
Elaine Fraser Trustee 14 July 2020
ROTHERFIELD ST MARTIN Received: On time
Leon Steer Chair 20 April 2016
ROTHERFIELD ST MARTIN Received: On time
Mark Howard Trustee 22 January 2018
ROTHERFIELD ST MARTIN Received: On time
Susan Taylor Trustee 04 February 2019
ROTHERFIELD ST MARTIN Received: On time
John O'Conor Trustee 30 October 2018
ROTHERFIELD ST MARTIN Received: On time