Trustees STONDON VILLAGE HALL MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE
Charity number: 1118603
Charity reporting is overdue by 182 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sadia Shafiq Dibbens | Trustee | 01 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Iain Peter McLean Charnley | Trustee | 03 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Stacey Leanne Searle | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Stondon Parish Council | Trustee | 04 October 2017 |
|
|||||
Nancy Jane Campbell | Trustee | 20 October 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.