Financial history THE HOLME VALLEY TRANSPORT SCHEME

Charity number: 1119261
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £9.01k £11.71k £19.79k £17.64k £32.55k
Total expenditure £11.62k £11.35k £13.03k £14.58k £14.59k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A