NEWARK TOWN BOWLS CLUB

Charity number: 1118680
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 13/10/2016 13/10/2017 13/10/2018 13/10/2019 13/08/2020
Total gross income £10.01k £13.75k £9.60k £5.80k £17.27k
Total expenditure £17.94k £7.62k £10.57k £6.32k £6.50k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.10k £0 N/A N/A £12.00k