AMITY EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1133629
Charity reporting is up to date (6 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2020 06 April 2021 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 06 April 2021 6 days late Download
Annual return 31 May 2019 28 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 28 March 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2018 18 April 2019 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 18 April 2019 18 days late Download
Annual return 31 May 2017 11 April 2018 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 11 April 2018 11 days late Download
Annual return 31 May 2016 24 April 2017 24 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2016 24 April 2017 24 days late Download