WILTSHIRE BLIND ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1119462
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £112.73k £179.74k £179.38k £176.42k £56.96k
Total expenditure £258.56k £255.43k £213.87k £214.12k £146.94k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A