Trustees NAVJIVAN VADIL KENDRA
Charity number: 1121930
Charity reporting is up to date (21 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Vinodchandra Prabhudas Parekh President | Chair | 01 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
Jaykumar Shah Treasurer | Trustee | 14 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Maheshchandra Devchand Savadia | Trustee | 14 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jayantilal Uttamchand Doshi | Trustee | 14 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
KUSUM DHANVANT PUNATER | Trustee | 02 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
HARSHVADAN MANDALIA | Trustee | 02 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr MAHENDRA SHAMJI VORA | Trustee | 01 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
KISHOR DOSHI | Trustee | 01 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Purnima Mehta Secretary | Trustee | 01 June 2017 |
|
|||||
Chiman Sheth | Trustee | 14 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
HASMUKHLAL PRANLAL VALLABHJI PAREKH | Trustee | 09 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
PRAFULCHANDRA GULABRAI SHAH | Trustee | 09 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
ELLA SHAH | Trustee | 09 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr VINOD KAPASHI OBE | Trustee | 23 May 2011 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.