THE DUCHENNE RESEARCH FUND

Charity number: 1119068
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £274.28k £1.37m £596.44k £1.87m £373.05k
Total expenditure £764.09k £756.61k £725.39k £603.64k £548.27k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £1.22m £212.45k £85.78k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A £260 £378.99k £1.79m N/A
Income - Other N/A £153.68k £5.00k £700 N/A
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £483.18k £335.34k £599.94k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £273.43k £11.57k £3.69k N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £4.32k £4.20k £4.46k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £378.48k £0 N/A