Linked charities BULWELL ACADEMY TRUST
Charity number: 1118982
Removed charity
Linked charities
Governing document
DEED OF GIFT AND DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 16 MAY 2007 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED 29 OCTOBER 2007 AND RESOLUTION DATED 1 MARCH 2016
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE FOR THE PUBIC BENEFIT EDUCATION IN THE UNITED KINGDOM, IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING BY ESTABLISHING, MAINTAINING, CARRYING ON, MANAGING AND DEVELOPING A SCHOOL OFFERING A BROAD CURRICULUM WITH A STRONG EMPHASIS ON, BUT IN NO WAY LIMITED TO BUSINESS AND ENTERPRISE.
Area of benefit
IN THE UNITED KINGDOM
Registration history
- 04 March 2010 : Standard registration
- 25 August 2011 : Removed
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.