Trustees THE STEPHEN PERSE FOUNDATION
Charity number: 1120608
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Windmill | Chair | 26 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nathaniel Segaren | Trustee | 28 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lavinia Abell | Trustee | 30 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Janet Magee | Trustee | 30 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Beastall | Trustee | 13 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon Thorley | Trustee | 13 February 2023 |
|
|||||
Sara Russo | Trustee | 13 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Farrimond | Trustee | 12 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Francis Routh Prof | Trustee | 11 February 2022 |
|
|||||
Leah Dubery Bramwell | Trustee | 25 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ray Anderson | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
MUNISH DATTA | Trustee | 28 November 2019 |
|
|||||
DAVID EDWIN GILL | Trustee | 27 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Hugh Shercliff | Trustee | 27 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sven Jurgen Topel | Trustee | 30 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr Victor Christou | Trustee | 30 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR ROBERT DAVID FOALE | Trustee | 24 September 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.