THE SAVIOUR TRUST

Charity number: 1122886
Charity reporting is up to date (2 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £877.11k £1.15m £1.62m £2.27m £3.11m
Total expenditure £807.26k £1.07m £1.48m £2.08m £2.77m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £99.92k £98.11k N/A £101.60k £104.11k
Income - Donations and legacies £102.82k £101.30k £99.64k £102.00k £104.11k
Income - Other trading activities £9.02k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £765.26k £1.04m £1.52m £2.17m £3.01m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £13 £12 £134 £512 £507
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £807.26k £1.07m £1.48m £2.08m £2.77m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £13.79k £10.87k £13.09k £15.38k £12.53k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0