DIASPORA FOR BO DEVELOPMENT- (DFBD)

Charity number: 1120683
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/05/2016 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020
Total gross income £3.92k £4.31k £6.00k £6.25k £8.60k
Total expenditure £3.79k £3.98k £3.00k £2.35k £650
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A