THE DOROTHY SPRINGER TRUST

Charity number: 1120537
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £11.06k £14.53k £7.82k £13.60k £7.66k
Total expenditure £12.69k £21.04k £10.00k £16.48k £9.70k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A