CLEFT

Charity number: 1119630
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

20 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Tracy Morris Trustee 11 July 2017 None on record
Timothy Goodacre Trustee 28 January 2021 None on record
Georgie Wilkins Trustee 16 September 2020
CLEFT Recently registered
ROSIE O'MALLEY Trustee 25 April 2013
CLEFT Recently registered
RORY WALKER Trustee
CLEFT Recently registered
MARK JAMES DWYER Trustee
CLEFT Recently registered
Rona Caroline Slator Trustee 14 March 2021
CLEFT Recently registered
JANETTE HOLLINGBERY Trustee 01 April 2014
CLEFT Recently registered
Yul Kahn-Pascual Trustee 15 November 2018
CLEFT Recently registered
Andrew Steel Trustee 30 August 2017
CLEFT Recently registered
David Sainsbury Trustee 28 January 2021 None on record
Dr EMILY ANDERSON Trustee 25 April 2013 None on record
BRIAN CLIVE SOMMERLAD Chair None on record
Jason Baldwin Trustee 15 October 2018
CLEFT Recently registered
Norman Hay Trustee 01 March 2016
CLEFT Recently registered
RICHARD ALLAN Trustee 02 October 2014
CLEFT Recently registered
Bruce Richard Trustee 28 January 2021
CLEFT Recently registered
Marie Pinkstone Trustee 15 November 2018
CLEFT Recently registered
Kaye Knowles Trustee 16 January 2018
CLEFT Recently registered
Matthew Fell Trustee 28 January 2021 None on record