Accounts and annual returns THE QUAERERE ACADEMY TRUST
Charity number: 1119628
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2010 | 05 April 2011 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2010 | 14 January 2011 | On time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2009 | 18 May 2010 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2009 | 14 December 2009 | On time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2008 | 15 June 2009 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2008 | 07 January 2009 | On time |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window