RAGE ARTS

Charity number: 1120152
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Other income £39.59k £16.93k £9.50k £14.13k £24.96k
Total expenditure £16.52k £26.57k £16.68k £14.39k £22.40k