BREAD OF LIFE CHRISTIAN CHURCH IN NORTH LONDON

Charity number: 1122239
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £11.24k £11.81k £15.87k £19.11k £20.95k
Total expenditure £8.34k £14.45k £18.59k £15.53k £21.36k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A