Financial history BEST BEGINNINGS

Charity number: 1120054
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £1.03m £937.28k £1.14m £1.90m £1.68m
Total expenditure £1.03m £1.05m £1.07m £1.51m £1.94m
Income from government contracts £102.13k £140.80k N/A £60.00k £232.73k
Income from government grants N/A £145.60k £37.23k £34.88k £232.73k
Income - Donations and legacies £634.73k £420.20k £0 £699.13k £694.10k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £206.11k £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £227.77k £310.55k £1.14m £996.02k £984.33k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £78 £416 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £164.87k £0 £0 £202.14k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £927.91k £951.19k £926.84k £1.34m £1.70m
Expenditure - Raising funds £98.43k £100.73k £143.12k £162.57k £234.65k
Expenditure - Governance £39.75k £0 £0 £208.19k £21.99k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £174.50k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0