Accounts and annual returns THE LIONS CLUB OF CHELTENHAM
Charity number: 1119298
Charity reporting is overdue by 699 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 334 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 334 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 699 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 699 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 19 February 2021 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2019 | 01 August 2019 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2018 | 08 November 2018 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2018 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window