GREATER READING NEPALESE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1123500
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 01/02/2016 01/02/2017 01/02/2018 01/02/2019 01/02/2020
Total gross income £64.01k £36.90k £40.45k £29.88k £68.63k
Total expenditure £50.98k £47.11k £33.11k £28.87k £38.58k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £9.76k £0 £0 N/A N/A