Governing document NAPTON SPORTS ASSOCIATION
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 SEPTEMBER 2007. as amended on 01 Apr 2019 as amended on 15 May 2019 as amended on 26 Jun 2019 as amended on 30 Jan 2024
Charitable objects
The objective of The Association shall be to promote sport in Napton and to maintain and operate a sport and leisure facility situated on Priors Marson Road, Napton (the “Sports Facilities”) for the benefit of the community in the Parish of Napton.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE NAPTON, WARWICKSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.