Trustees THE ELDERS COUNCIL OF NEWCASTLE LIMITED
Charity number: 1122424
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anne Raffle | Chair | 24 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Nadeem Syed Ahmad | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Diane Margaret Scott | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Bruce Telfer | Trustee | 20 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Simon Bruce Davenport | Trustee | 09 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Keith John Williamson | Trustee | 23 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alan Chalmers Gowers | Trustee | 07 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
VIOLET ROOK | Trustee | 07 July 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.