GODS AND MONSTERS THEATRE LIMITED

Charity number: 1124446
Charity reporting is up to date (5 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £90.44k £90.53k £109.99k £133.98k £79.24k
Total expenditure £97.80k £89.87k £121.97k £108.45k £103.15k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £11.17k N/A N/A