Trustees SUFFOLK YOUNG PEOPLE'S THEATRE
Charity number: 1124625
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
IAN JAMES SHIPLEY | Chair | 01 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Emily Grace Scott | Trustee | 26 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Easdown | Trustee | 10 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Zoe Torode | Trustee | 21 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alan Beckett | Trustee | 09 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Esterhuizen | Trustee | 22 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
DAPHNE DYER | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.