Accounts and annual returns THE HAJI GHULAM NABIR AND HAJAN ALLAH RAKHI EDUCATION AND WELFARE ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1120366
Charity reporting is overdue by 515 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 150 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 150 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 515 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 515 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 February 2023 | 373 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 September 2022 | 234 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 February 2023 | 738 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 February 2023 | 738 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 29 November 2022 | 1033 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window