THE WELCHES TRUST

Charity number: 1120020
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020 30/04/2021
Total gross income £6.29k £6.21k £5.54k £8.34k £8.27k
Total expenditure £6.76k £6.22k £5.57k £8.32k £8.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A