SCARBOROUGH DISABLED SWIMMING GROUP

Charity number: 1125170
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £7.83k £17.01k £20.97k £10.68k £74.28k
Total expenditure £7.72k £13.52k £26.19k £9.71k £7.60k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £3.50k £500 N/A £10.00k