CHAPEL PARK COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1126095
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £27.51k £32.79k £18.34k £48.23k £28.96k
Total expenditure £24.01k £24.70k £26.15k £28.61k £33.24k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A