Financial history SOUTHWARK THEATRES' EDUCATION PARTNERSHIP

Charity number: 1121201
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £1.01k £1.09k £1.10k £1.01k £4
Total expenditure £3.42k £2.32k £1.54k £1.25k £244
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A