HOPE 4 THE WORLD

Charity number: 1120879
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £62.40k £52.46k £60.72k £39.36k £62.65k
Total expenditure £62.37k £57.06k £64.61k £36.50k £64.39k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A