Governing document THE STRATFORD-UPON-AVON SYMPHONY ORCHESTRA
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7 MAY 1965 AS AMENDED 29 SEPTEMBER 1995 AND 8 NOVEMBER 2002. AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 01 MAR 2019 as amended on 14 Oct 2022
Charitable objects
THE ORCHESTRA’S OBJECTS ARE TO PROMOTE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN AND THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF THE APPRECIATION OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC, IN ALL ITS ASPECTS, AND PARTICULARLY ORCHESTRAL AND ENSEMBLE PLAYING; BY I. PERFORMING AND PRESENTING CONCERTS AND RECITALS ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD, AND PARTICULARLY IN OR AROUND THE TOWN OF STRATFORD UPON AVON, IN THE COUNTY OF WARWICKSHIRE, ENGLAND; II. PROMOTING, IMPROVING, DEVELOPING, ASSISTING, MAINTAINING, SUPPORTING AND COOPERATING WITH ANY CHARITABLE OR OTHER BODY WITH OBJECTS WHICH ARE SUBSTANTIALLY SIMILAR OR IDENTICAL TO, OR IN THE REASONABLE OPINION OF THE COMMITTEE, COMPATIBLE WITH THOSE OF THE ORCHESTRA; III. PROMOTING, IMPROVING, DEVELOPING, ASSISTING, MAINTAINING, SUPPORTING AND COOPERATING WITH ANY OTHER CHARITABLE OR OTHER BODY WHICH THE COMMITTEE MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE TO SUPPORT.
Area of benefit
STRATFORD-UPON-AVON, WARWICKSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.