Financial history CORNERSTONE YOUTH LINK STEVENAGE

Charity number: 1122869
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £2.00k £1.35k £1.84k £1.99k £6.96k
Total expenditure £4.91k £1.96k £2.03k £5.81k £3.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A