Accounts and annual returns DANCE IN DEVON LIMITED

Charity number: 1132898
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2023 Overdue Overdue by 172 days
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 Overdue Overdue by 172 days
Annual return 28 February 2022 07 November 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 07 November 2022 On time
Annual return 28 February 2021 08 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 08 December 2021 On time
Annual return 29 February 2020 04 January 2021 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 04 January 2021 6 days late
Annual return 28 February 2019 20 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 20 December 2019 On time