ST SERAPHIM'S TRUST

Charity number: 1120335
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £20.26k £36.16k £72.07k £24.90k £43.61k
Total expenditure £15.97k £66.93k £13.21k £69.53k £31.06k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A