Financial history CLARE KING CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1120765
Charity reporting is up to date (22 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020 31/05/2021
Total gross income £11.67k £13.09k £15.24k £16.20k £11.59k
Total expenditure £7.37k £34.51k £39.35k £37.30k £4.44k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A