Financial history FAMILY EMPOWERMENT NETWORK INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1123695
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £2.70k £2.40k £7.02k £9.02k £9.50k
Total expenditure £2.50k £2.39k £6.91k £8.92k £4.36k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A